Accounts and annual returns THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 229907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window