Trustees THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 229907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE VENERABLE NEIL MICHAEL WARWICK Trustee 13 August 2019
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
Canon Edward Buchan Trustee 01 February 2018
WILTSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
JERUSALEM LODGE NO 197 BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
PETER DAVID GIFFORD Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
Mrs Sandra Sykes Trustee 28 April 2016
SIXTY-ONE
Received: On time
GRECA ANNE WARR Trustee 20 January 2016
None on record
Dr LUCY VICTORIA SWITHINBANK MA BS MD Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
ANDREW STREET Trustee 23 October 2014
COMMUNITY INITIATIVES SOUTH WEST LIMITED
Received: On time
SIXTY-ONE
Received: On time
SPEAR BRISTOL
Recently registered
KNOWLE WEST BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRISTOL INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
inHope (Bristol) Limited
Received: On time
PRODIGAL ARTS
Received: On time
FEEDING BRISTOL
Received: On time
Rev Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Trustee 20 April 2013
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE
Received: On time
COLIN HAVILL Trustee 12 January 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONG ASHTON
Received: On time
THE BURDEN TRUST
Received: 3 days late