Financial history WILLIAM JONES'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 230514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £187.56k £193.54k £198.21k £194.79k £206.76k
Total expenditure £173.11k £162.99k £192.32k £246.26k £239.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A