ROYAL HUMANE SOCIETY

Charity number: 231469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Luke Chauveau Trustee 13 April 2016 None on record
LYNDA ROSE MBE Trustee None on record
Mark Dunbar Dickson Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
Diane Duke LVO DL Trustee 14 July 2015 None on record
George Hawkins Trustee 14 January 2015 None on record
RUPERT NOVIS Trustee None on record
Anna Blaxland Trustee 14 July 2015 None on record
SIR NIGEL RALPH SOUTHWARD KCVO Trustee None on record
KATE HOLT Trustee 12 March 2018
RE:ACT Disaster Response Limited
JOHN GRANDY Chair None on record
RUPERT ULOTH Trustee None on record
Sheridan Swallow Trustee 12 March 2018
ACS INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS LIMITED Received: On time
CHARLES SPICER Trustee 16 April 2013 None on record
Michael Bernard Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Dr MICHAEL DERMOT MCCALDIN Trustee 14 January 2015
THE BRISTOL AND WEST OF ENGLAND APPEAL FOR A CHAIR IN ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY AT THE UNIVERSITY AT BRISTOL Received: On time
Rowena Osborne Trustee 14 January 2015 None on record