Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - LLANGOLLEN BRANCH

Charity number: 231614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required