WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - CROMER

Charity number: 231919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £4.16k £3.56k £2.50k £2.24k £2.49k
Total expenditure £4.03k £3.53k £7.06k £7.36k £1.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A