WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - CROMER

Charity number: 231919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Woolard Trustee 13 November 2014 None on record
Prudence Mead Trustee 28 November 2013 None on record
Judith Roberts Chair 08 November 2018 None on record
Christine Leake Trustee 10 November 2016 None on record
Rosie Evans Miss Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
YVONNE HOGGARTH Trustee 09 November 2017 None on record
Elaine Spittles Trustee 10 November 2016 None on record
Doreen Amey Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record