ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HULL AND EAST RIDING BRANCH

Charity number: 232225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Dymond Trustee 25 October 2018 None on record
Jae Saleh Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Vicky O'Grady Trustee 23 October 2014 None on record
SHIRLEY WHARMBY Trustee None on record
Emma Dallimore Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
Hazel Saleh Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
Suzanne Hughes Trustee 09 January 2020 None on record