Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WADSWORTH

Charity number: 232646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required