Trustees CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WADSWORTH

Charity number: 232646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Ruth Teal Chair 25 July 2017
None on record
Rev Kathia Andree Shoesmith Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
JOHN Brian KIDDLE Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
HAZEL BEECHAM Trustee 08 August 2018
None on record
ANDREA GORNALL Trustee 08 August 2018
None on record
Geraldine Ann Norrish Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
Sheridan Moore Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record