Financial history CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WADSWORTH

Charity number: 232646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.73k £16.75k £17.07k £17.21k £17.50k
Total expenditure £11.46k £11.50k £11.05k £13.55k £12.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A