THE ABBEYFIELD SANDERSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 233004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On time Download