LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 233695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter William Alan Hughes Trustee 29 July 2014 None on record
Douglas Brian Dale Trustee 27 January 2015
WORCESTER LODGE NO 280 BICENTENARY CHORAL FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP Received: On time
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
THREE CHOIRS FESTIVAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
MRS G T NEWMAN Trustee 22 November 2012
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
Kay Vincent Trustee 31 October 2017
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
MR J V PANTER Chair
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
THE WORCESTER HERITAGE AND AMENITY TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
MICHAEL TARVER Trustee 29 October 2014
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
MRS M JONES Trustee
JOHN PALMER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ARMCHAIR TRUST CIO Received: On time
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
WORCESTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (CIO) Received: On time
MR T J BRIDGES Trustee
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND DUDLEY HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST Received: On time
EARLS CROOME CHURCH AND TOWER PROJECT Received: On time
Lorraine Angela Preece Trustee 30 July 2019
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
Laura Catherine Nancy Baxter Trustee 01 January 2021
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
Nicola Jane Rogers Trustee 01 April 2021
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time
COLIN ANSTEY Trustee 27 January 2015
LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY Received: On time