LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 233695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time Download