BARONESS ROLLE'S WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 233855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 December 2016 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required