BARONESS ROLLE'S WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 233855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN JOHN WHITE Chair 23 November 2013 None on record
Maureen Westlake Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
DAVID MARTIN BOALCH Trustee None on record
JANET ANN BEAVIS Trustee 30 June 2014 None on record
GARETH RICHARD PHILLIPS Trustee 19 March 2013 None on record
Katherine Reed Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record