HELSTON DOWNSLAND CHARITY

Charity number: 235477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.61k £24.94k £53.17k £30.75k £27.56k
Total expenditure £32.06k £48.21k £68.81k £11.87k £49.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A