HELSTON DOWNSLAND CHARITY

Charity number: 235477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
melissa benyon Trustee 10 May 2021 None on record
Timothy Esmond Grattan-Kane Chair 22 April 2016 None on record
Peter matthew WEbb Trustee 10 May 2021 None on record
CLLR Felicity Nicola Boase Trustee
TREVENEN EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT Received: On time
SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time
THE HELSTON WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
JOHN MARTIN Trustee 19 November 2012
KOSEL DEMENTIA TRUST, HELSTON Received: On time
TREVENEN EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT Received: On time
samuel Luke Ramsden Trustee 10 June 2021 None on record
CLLR RON WILLIAMS Trustee
STITHIANS AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
TREVENEN EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT Received: On time
THE HELSTON WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
Miles Jonathon Kenchington Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
CLLR MICHAEL HENRY THOMAS Trustee None on record
Rev Daniel Paul Reed Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
CLLR JOHN BOASE Trustee
HELSTON & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Received: On time
SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time