SIR WALTER MOYLE'S ALMSHOUSES, ST GERMANS

Charity number: 238800
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £18.48k £18.48k £16.70k £18.00k £20.14k
Total expenditure £12.50k £25.01k £10.48k £15.00k £24.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A