THE SIMPSON HALL

Charity number: 239038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £15.47k £14.25k £13.97k £13.97k £19.38k
Total expenditure £11.38k £10.42k £11.49k £11.49k £19.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £240 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 £0 N/A N/A £10.50k