THE SIMPSON HALL

Charity number: 239038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cyrus Amini Trustee 18 February 2020 None on record
Mark Medlicott Helme Chair 18 February 2020
CHURCH STREET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Enid Davies Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
DILYS PRICE Trustee None on record
DAVID RIX Trustee None on record
Graham Gilbert Trustee 29 January 2019 None on record
MRS TWINK HELME Trustee None on record
Jaque Newton Trustee 29 January 2019 None on record
COLIN PALMER Trustee 11 February 2013 None on record
Sue Rix Trustee 07 April 2021 None on record