LINCOLNSHIRE Y.M.C.A. LTD

Charity number: 243017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.91m £3.18m £3.11m £6.14m £4.55m
Total expenditure £2.88m £2.94m £3.10m £3.68m £4.26m
Income from government contracts £142.19k £2.00m £1.96m £2.12m £2.34m
Income from government grants £71.37k £166.13k £59.00k £32.00k £295.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £159.74k £303.36k £205.88k £1.67m £105.90k
Income - Other trading activities £292.37k £290.99k £296.96k £312.20k £125.08k
Income - Charitable activities £2.46m £2.58m £2.59m £4.14m £4.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.15k £4.60k £11.56k £266 £43
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £23.88k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £21.32k £1.01k £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.51m £2.60m £2.71m £3.41m £4.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £361.56k £63.95k £389.17k £39.38k £59.76k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £8.00k £0 £56.59k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £1.28k £0 £10.31k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £270.42k £0 £228.96k £104.29k