LINCOLNSHIRE Y.M.C.A. LTD

Charity number: 243017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2013
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. B) THE RELIEF AND CARE OF PERSONS IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE CAE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN CONVICTED OF CRIMINAL OFFENCES AND WHO ARE HOMELESS OR SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY OR WHO BY REASON OF ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES (INCLUDING THEIR PAST MANNER OF LIFE OR CRIMINAL ACTS) ALCOHOLISM, DRUG DEPENDENCY OR ILL HEALTH ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS MENTIONED IN SUB-CLAUSE B. WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. D) THE RELIEF OF NEED FOR THE HOMELESS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THEIR ACCOMMODATION. E) THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND GOODS. F) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE. IN THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 15 December 2008 : Standard registration