INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) LTD

Charity number: 243606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £288.31k £291.60k £296.65k £304.54k £244.82k
Total expenditure £243.70k £249.21k £333.15k £226.22k £245.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A