INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) LTD

Charity number: 243606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valeria Martinelli Trustee 15 November 2011
CARE IN EAST GRINSTEAD AND LINGFIELD Received: On time
DAVID COBB Chair 21 June 1995 None on record
Dr Yun-Han Chen Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Dr STEPHEN GRUPPETTA Trustee 14 November 2005 None on record
BASKAR SHANMUGAM SUNDARAM Trustee 15 November 2011 None on record
Ishan Kavan Abeysekera Trustee 16 March 2016 None on record
Rev Paul Andrew Bagott Trustee 06 November 2013
CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY WESTALL FOR POOR Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT WITH ST MATTHIAS EARL'S COURT Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE CHARLOTTE OLIPHANT BOUNTY Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF OUR LADY OF PEW IN WESTMINSTER ABBEY Received: On time
EDWARD GARTON WOODS Trustee 29 March 2005
HORRIS HILL PREPARATORY SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Calin Andrei Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
Christopher Schiele Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
CRAWFORD IAN ANTHONY EDLINGTON Trustee 05 July 2004 None on record