THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 244519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.94m £1.67m £1.63m £1.54m £1.64m
Total expenditure £3.06m £2.59m £4.51m £5.02m £4.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.94m £1.67m £1.63m £1.54m £1.64m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.44m £1.89m £4.09m £4.76m £3.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £695.30k £421.81k £267.03k £380.45k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £41.30k £39.40k £477.35k £35.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.93m £1.49m £3.64m £4.28m £3.53m
Expenditure - Investment management £621.59k £695.30k £421.81k £267.03k £380.45k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0