THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 244519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Paisner Trustee 05 April 1995
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 1 day late
BEN GURION UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION Received: On time
NEW ISRAEL FUND Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION Overdue by 75 days
HOLOCAUST EDUCATIONAL TRUST
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE RAYMAN HANBURY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK Received: On time
THE SIERATZKI CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF EDITH WOLFSON HOSPITAL Overdue by 441 days
SHAARE ZEDEK UK Received: On time
THE PHILLIPS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ELLA LATCHMAN Trustee 05 April 1965
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
DANIEL ISAAC DOVER Trustee 09 March 2005
BDO CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE APELT AND LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
SIR IAN GAINSFORD Trustee 11 October 2005
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
PROFESSOR DAVID LATCHMAN Chair 05 April 1985
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION Received: On time