THE ABBEY THEATRE TRUST (ST ALBANS) LIMITED

Charity number: 247839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £192.21k £221.72k £204.30k £230.46k £189.53k
Total expenditure £211.05k £229.59k £230.03k £251.47k £208.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k