THE ABBEY THEATRE TRUST (ST ALBANS) LIMITED

Charity number: 247839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Jane Kennedy Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Apryl Alexandra Kelly Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Karen Thomas Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Ian David Barrett Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Peter James Hale Trustee 24 March 2014 None on record
Martin Goodman Chair 01 May 2015
YOUNG PEOPLE'S PUPPET THEATRE Received: On time
Mark Robert Coltman Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
GILLIAN SANDRA STRATFORD Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Sinead Maria Dunne Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Dr Paul Davidson Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Philip Reardon Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Katherine Barry Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Ian Ronald Williams Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record