Accounts and annual returns WILTSHIRE CREATIVE

Charity number: 249169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window