Trustees WILTSHIRE CREATIVE

Charity number: 249169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY CRARER Chair
None on record
Darren James Neale Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Richard Harvey Trustee 27 June 2019
GILLINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
Thomas Frederick Clay Trustee 28 March 2019
SALISBURY CITY ALMSHOUSE AND WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY
Received: On time
HELEN JUDITH BIRCHENOUGH Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
Kathryn Louise Dalton Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
JOHN GRENFELL RUSSELL PERRY MA Trustee 19 February 2015
THE SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Nick Frankfort Trustee 14 November 2013
None on record
DORIC ALFRED HOWARD BOSSOM Trustee 05 December 2011
None on record