Trustees THE QUEEN'S ROYAL SURREY REGIMENT COMBINED CHARITIES

Charity number: 249538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLONEL PATRICK TIMOTHY CROWLEY MBE DL Chair 08 April 2017
PRINCESS OF WALES'S ROYAL REGIMENT (QUEEN'S AND ROYAL HAMPSHIRES) BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
SURREY ARMY CADET FORCE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SOUTH EAST RESERVES AND CADETS WELFARE FUND
Received: On time
Colonel John Richard Cottam White Trustee 08 January 2022
None on record
Peter Malcolm Harry McGill Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
MAJOR DAVID RONALD POLLARD BA Trustee 11 April 2018
PWRR AND QUEEN'S REGIMENT MUSEUM CIO
Recently registered
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' AND WISLEY CHURCHES
Received: On time
THE PRINCESS OF WALES'S ROYAL REGIMENT AND QUEEN'S REGIMENT MUSEUM MAINTENANCE FUND
Received: On time
Lt Col Peter Ridley Palmer Swanson Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Ian Eric John Chatfield Trustee 10 October 2015
OLD KILN MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
OLD KILN MUSEUM CIO
Recently registered
MAJOR MICHAEL JOHN JARRATT Trustee 11 October 2014
None on record
Colonel ANTONY PAUL GUTHRIE TD DL FRIC Trustee 06 April 2013
CHARITY OF JOHN MARSHALL
Received: On time
Brigadier JULIAN ANTHONY LADD Trustee 06 June 2012
None on record
Andrew Duncan RUTTER Trustee 06 June 2012
None on record
Anthony Clark Ward OBE DL Trustee 31 December 2011
ROTARY CLUB OF HASLEMERE TRUST FUND
Received: On time