THE HOWARD LEAGUE FOR PENAL REFORM (INCORPORATING THE HOWARD CENTRE FOR PENOLOGY)

Charity number: 251926
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 April 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 April 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 02 December 2016 On time Download