THE HOWARD LEAGUE FOR PENAL REFORM (INCORPORATING THE HOWARD CENTRE FOR PENOLOGY)

Charity number: 251926
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.10m £1.07m £957.03k £2.43m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.38m £1.33m £1.27m £1.43m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £292.97k £249.12k £247.98k £317.54k £270.64k
Income - Other trading activities £15.13k £47.92k £58.96k £0 £58.90k
Income - Charitable activities £732.02k £722.78k £610.95k £2.02m £1.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £62.74k £50.57k £39.15k £40.63k £64.38k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £59.61k £32.70k
Income - Legacies £40.74k £18.20k £4.60k £93.77k £141.81k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.28m £1.25m £1.22m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £242.99k £100.80k £77.83k £50.12k £55.15k
Expenditure - Governance £65.67k £83.90k £86.34k £86.34k £52.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.68k £3.56k £1.99k £1.99k £3.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0