CHURCHES' LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE (CLAS)

Charity number: 256303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Memuna Levan-Harris Trustee 19 September 2019
ACTIVE LIGHTWORKS LTD Received: On time
Caroline Jane Louise Sanderson Trustee 09 June 2016
THE PERCY RUOFF CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
REDCLIFFE COLLEGE
ALL NATIONS CHRISTIAN COLLEGE LIMITED Received: On time
Joanne Mary Anderton Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
RICHARD CHAPMAN Trustee 23 July 2013 None on record
Mary Macleod Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN ROTHON MA Trustee
THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND Received: On time
SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND Received: On time
THE APOSTOLIC NUNCIATURE HOLY SEE-VATICAN EMBASSY Received: On time
Rev Paul Rochester Trustee 09 June 2016 None on record
The Rt Reverend David Urquhart KCMG Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record