Accounts and annual returns ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window