Accounts and annual returns ROBERT WATCHORN TRUST

Charity number: 258369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 September 2022 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 November 2021 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 September 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 September 2020 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 May 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required