Financial history AGAPE MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 258421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.62m £2.79m £2.81m £3.16m £3.67m
Total expenditure £2.60m £2.61m £2.77m £3.09m £3.62m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.56m £2.74m £2.76m £3.10m £3.65m
Income - Other trading activities £17.60k £14.45k £15.51k £17.46k £12.48k
Income - Charitable activities £40.06k £37.94k £26.31k £40.76k £1.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.38k £1.61k £2.05k £4.79k £4.62k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £30.79k £1.00k £49.91k £22.63k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.51m £2.63m £2.86m £3.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £99.65k £84.50k £127.69k £184.57k £88.69k
Expenditure - Governance £7.95k £7.95k £0 £9.00k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £103.95k £90.76k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £13.27k £13.27k £18.00k £44.85k £21.73k