Trustees AGAPE MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 258421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARY PALMER Chair 19 December 2011
INTENTIONAL HEALTH
Received: On time
Dermot Purcell Trustee 28 April 2021
AFRIDI BROTHERS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Joanne Arkell Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
Kevin Russell Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Rev Richard Boothroyd Trustee 23 August 2016
None on record
JAVIER GARCIA Trustee
None on record