Financial history YEOMANRY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 259125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £133.27k £31.64k £32.31k £29.04k £30.47k
Total expenditure £29.16k £36.44k £30.96k £28.45k £36.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A