Financial history THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH

Charity number: 260059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £32.94m £21.16m £11.14m £8.81m £10.80m
Total expenditure £32.81m £15.34m £13.96m £9.96m £20.81m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.00k £4.00k £4.00k £3.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £26.62m £0 £1.43m £1.04m £748.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £14.46m £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.32m £6.68m £9.70m £7.76m £10.04m
Income - Other £0 £16.00k £4.00k £0 £11.00k
Income - Legacies £3.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.48m £4.49m £8.70m £8.07m £18.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.33m £10.85m £5.27m £1.90m £2.13m
Expenditure - Governance £149.00k £55.00k £98.00k £128.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.33m £4.36m £8.47m £7.76m £18.44m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.16m £1.26m £1.77m £1.19m £1.58m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0