THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH

Charity number: 260059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR HILL GASTON Trustee
CAMBRIDGE ARTHRITIS RESEARCH ENDEAVOUR (CARE) Received: On time
The Faraday Institute for Science and Religion Received: On time
PROFESSOR STEPHEN TOWNLEY HOLGATE Chair 09 May 2013 None on record
Dr Paul Wayne Satchell Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Professor Michael Alexander Patton Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Mark Stefano Dighero Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Christopher John Coombe Trustee 22 June 2021
SCLERODERMA & RAYNAUD'S UK Received: On time
THE SCLERODERMA SOCIETY Received: On time
DAVID PATERSON Trustee None on record
Victoria Louise White Trustee 11 December 2018
SPEAKERS TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Edmund Buckley Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
MARGARET FROST Trustee 05 December 2011 None on record
Professor Andrew Cope Trustee 09 December 2014
UKRAINE CHRISTIAN PARTNERSHIP Received: On time
JENNIFER JOHNSON Trustee None on record
Richard Kenneth Punt Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record