Accounts and annual returns EDMUND ARNOLD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 260589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window