THE BALINT SOCIETY

Charity number: 261387
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 March 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 March 2020 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2019 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2019 265 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download