THE BALINT SOCIETY

Charity number: 261387
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £10.07k £59.87k £51.88k £172.44k £71.57k
Total expenditure £7.25k £50.36k £75.12k £184.30k £61.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A