THE BALINT SOCIETY

Charity number: 261387
Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Joanne Carley Trustee 16 September 2018 None on record
DR JUDY MALONE Trustee 16 September 2018 None on record
Eamonn Marshall Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
DR JANE DAMMERS Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
DR Anne Patterson Trustee 16 September 2018 None on record
DR TOM McANEA Trustee 01 June 2012 None on record
Dr Sylvia Chudley Trustee 16 September 2018 None on record
DR CAROLINE SPENCER-PALMER Chair 01 April 2014 None on record
DR GEAROID FITZGERALD Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Dr Ann Dilys Evans Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record