Financial history QUATERNARY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 262124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £104.23k £117.61k £120.58k £131.07k £116.38k
Total expenditure £80.47k £105.05k £139.11k £60.53k £111.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A