Cambridgeshire, Peterborough and South Lincolnshire (CPSL) Mind Limited

Charity number: 265087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.51m £2.15m £1.85m £2.23m £2.57m
Total expenditure £1.49m £2.02m £2.08m £2.20m £2.38m
Income from government contracts £922.21k £1.58m £1.61m £1.50m £1.64m
Income from government grants £6.50k N/A N/A £282.87k £435.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £81.75k £171.79k £94.74k £144.57k £147.34k
Income - Other trading activities £106.68k £172.33k £142.25k £138.66k £76.25k
Income - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.80m £1.61m £1.94m £2.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £515 £1.86k £1.85k £2.85k £1.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £3.30k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £2.00m £2.06m £2.17m £2.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.30k £22.30k £27.40k £24.30k £23.70k
Expenditure - Governance £20.81k £21.84k £23.79k £0 £800
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0