Financial history PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE

Charity number: 265483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £5.94k £7.34k £6.93k £6.21k £7.83k
Total expenditure £7.03k £5.75k £6.69k £6.67k £7.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A