CREATIVE YOUTH NETWORK

Charity number: 266318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Imran Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
ROBERT NYE Trustee 16 May 2017 None on record
James Foreman Trustee 02 March 2021 None on record
Joanna Grant Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Kirsty Swan Trustee 12 September 2017 None on record
Katherine Ward Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record
Lucio Mesquita Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
MR BOB DURIE Trustee 26 June 2012 None on record
Adrew Peter Smith Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
Raj Kakar-Clayton Trustee 22 November 2016
QUARTET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time